WA HB2525 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the family connections program.
Title
Establishing the family connections program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | House | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-18 | House | Chapter 33, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-18 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-09 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | HSRR - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |
2020-02-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-13 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-12 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-08 | House | APP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Human Services & Early Learning. |
2020-02-08 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-01-29 | House | HSEL - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-29 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to Human Services & Early Learning. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6422 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.