WA HB2528 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizing the contributions of the state's forest products sector as part of the state's global climate response.
Title
Recognizing the contributions of the state's forest products sector as part of the state's global climate response.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Ramos [D] | Rep. Richard DeBolt [R] | Rep. Mike Chapman [D] | Sen. Matt Boehnke [R] |
Rep. Brian Blake [D] | Rep. Joe Fitzgibbon [D] | Rep. Steve Tharinger [D] | Rep. Sharon Santos [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-16 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-16 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-25 | House | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-25 | House | Chapter 120, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-25 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-12 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-09 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-03-09 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | AWNP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |
2020-02-16 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2020-02-16 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-16 | House | Floor amendment |
2020-02-16 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-10 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-10 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-08 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-06 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-02-04 | House | RDAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-04 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-28 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6355 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.