WA HB2529 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-31 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM.
Pending: House State Government & Tribal Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-31 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM.
Pending: House State Government & Tribal Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning odd-numbered year elections.
Title
Concerning odd-numbered year elections.
Sponsors
Rep. Mia Gregerson [D] | Rep. Debra Entenman [D] | Rep. Jake Fey [D] | Rep. Sharon Wylie [D] |
Rep. Jared Mead [D] | Rep. Strom Peterson [D] | Rep. My-Linh Thai [D] | Rep. Bill Ramos [D] |
Rep. Zack Hudgins [D] | Rep. Gael Tarleton [D] | Sen. Noel Frame [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-31 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6503 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-20 - First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2529&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2529.pdf |