WA HB2535 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for a grace period before late fees may be imposed for past due rent.
Title
Providing for a grace period before late fees may be imposed for past due rent.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-07 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 73 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-16 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-16 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-27 | House | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-27 | House | Chapter 177, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-27 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-11 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-07 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 73; nays, 24; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | FIET - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade. |
2020-02-16 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 92; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-02-16 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-16 | House | Floor amendment |
2020-02-16 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-01-31 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-01-31 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-01-31 | House | CRJ - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |