WA HB2540 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-6)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Clarifying when campaign funds may be used for child care expenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clarifying when campaign funds may be used for child care expenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-18 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12SenateBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2020-02-20SenateFirst reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections.
2020-02-18HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2020-02-18HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-04HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2020-02-03HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2020-01-31HouseSGOV - Majority; do pass.
2020-01-31HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM.
2020-01-29HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM.
2020-01-15HouseFirst reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback