WA HB2542 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning tuition waivers for children of eligible veterans.
Title
Concerning tuition waivers for children of eligible veterans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-29 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-29 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | HEWD - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development. |
2020-02-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-12 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-11 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-11 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-01-29 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-01-29 | House | CWD - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-29 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to College & Workforce Development. |