WA HB2551 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 3/18/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 3/18/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Permitting students to wear traditional tribal regalia and objects of cultural significance at graduation ceremonies and related events.
Title
Permitting students to wear traditional tribal regalia and objects of cultural significance at graduation ceremonies and related events.
Sponsors
Rep. Debra Lekanoff [D] | Rep. Alex Ramel [D] | Rep. Skyler Rude [R] | Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] |
Sen. Javier Valdez [D] | Rep. Lauren Davis [D] | Rep. Beth Doglio [D] | Rep. Amy Walen [D] |
Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] | Rep. Nicole Macri [D] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] | Rep. Sharon Santos [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | House | Effective date 3/18/2020. |
2020-03-18 | House | Chapter 35, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-18 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-09 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2020-02-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-02-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-12 | House | Floor amendment |
2020-02-12 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-07 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-07 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-07 | House | SGOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-07 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-04 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6607 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.