WA HB2554 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Mitigating inequity in the health insurance market caused by health plans that exclude certain mandated benefits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mitigating inequity in the health insurance market caused by health plans that exclude certain mandated benefits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 58 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-02HouseEffective date 6/11/2020.
2020-04-02HouseChapter 283, 2020 Laws.
2020-04-02HouseGovernor signed.
2020-03-12HouseDelivered to Governor.
2020-03-12SenatePresident signed.
2020-03-11HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-03-10HousePassed final passage; yeas, 58; nays, 39; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-03-10HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments.
2020-03-05SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 28; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2020-03-05SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-05SenateCommittee amendment
2020-03-04SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2020-03-02SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-02-28SenateMinority; do not pass.
2020-02-28SenateWM - Majority; do pass with amendment
2020-02-28SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2020-02-25SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2020-02-24SenateMinority; do not pass.
2020-02-24SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2020-02-24SenateHLTC - Majority; do pass with amendment
2020-02-24SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-21SenatePublic hearing and executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM.
2020-02-19SenateFirst reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.
2020-02-17HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 59; nays, 39; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2020-02-17HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-17House1st substitute bill substituted
2020-02-16HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2020-02-11HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2020-02-10HouseMinority; do not pass.
2020-02-10HouseAPP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Health Care & Wellness.
2020-02-10HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-08HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2020-02-07HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2020-02-05HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2020-02-05HouseMinority; do not pass.
2020-02-05HouseHCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-02-05HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-04HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2020-01-29HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2020-01-15HouseFirst reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.

Same As/Similar To

SB6400 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2554&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2554.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2554-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/2554-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/2554-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121303&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-17-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2554&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121303&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-05-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2554&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121303&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-10-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2554&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback