WA HB2565 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Effective date 7/1/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Effective date 7/1/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the labeling of disposable wipes products.
Title
Concerning the labeling of disposable wipes products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-07 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 36 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-16 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 36 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-16 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-25 | House | Effective date 7/1/2022. |
2020-03-25 | House | Chapter 121, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-25 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-11 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-07 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 93; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 36; nays, 10; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Committee amendment not adopted. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | ENET - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
2020-02-16 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 92; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2020-02-16 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-16 | House | Floor amendment |
2020-02-16 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-01-30 | House | ENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-30 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |