WA HB2587 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing a program for the designation of state scenic bikeways.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a program for the designation of state scenic bikeways.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-09 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-02HouseEffective date 6/11/2020.
2020-04-02HouseChapter 286, 2020 Laws.
2020-04-02HouseGovernor signed.
2020-03-12HouseDelivered to Governor.
2020-03-12SenatePresident signed.
2020-03-11HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-03-09HousePassed final passage; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2020-03-09HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments.
2020-03-06SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-03-06SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-06SenateCommittee amendment
2020-03-05SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2020-03-02SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-03-02SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2020-03-02SenateMinority; do not pass.
2020-03-02SenateWM - Majority; do pass with amendment
2020-03-02SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2020-02-29SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM.
2020-02-28SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2020-02-28SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2020-02-28SenateAWNP - Majority; do pass with amendment
2020-02-28SenatePublic hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-25SenateReferred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks.
2020-02-24SenateAnd refer to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks.
2020-02-24SenateTRAN - Majority; without recommendation.
2020-02-24SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2020-02-14SenateFirst reading, referred to Transportation.
2020-02-12HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-02-12HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-10HousePlaced on second reading.
2020-02-08HouseAPP - Majority; do pass.
2020-02-08HousePublic hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2020-02-03HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2020-01-31HouseHOUS - Majority; do pass.
2020-01-31HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 10:00 AM.
2020-01-29HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 8:00 AM.
2020-01-15HouseFirst reading, referred to Housing, Community Development & Veterans.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2587&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2587.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/2587.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/2587.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121336&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-12-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2587&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121336&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-06-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2587&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121336&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-09-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2587&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback