WA HB2588 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Improving openness, accountability, and transparency of special purpose districts.
Title
Improving openness, accountability, and transparency of special purpose districts.
Sponsors
Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] | Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] | Sen. Javier Valdez [D] | Rep. Tana Senn [D] |
Rep. Davina Duerr [D] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Sen. Noel Frame [D] | Sen. Matt Boehnke [R] |
Rep. Zack Hudgins [D] | Rep. Vicki Kraft [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-07 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 90 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-27 | House | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-27 | House | Chapter 179, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-27 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-11 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-07 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 90; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | LGOV - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2020-02-19 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 91; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-02-19 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-19 | House | Floor amendment |
2020-02-19 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-17 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-01-24 | House | LG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |