WA HB2589 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-6)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-6)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring contact information for suicide prevention and crisis intervention organizations on student and staff identification cards.
Title
Requiring contact information for suicide prevention and crisis intervention organizations on student and staff identification cards.
Sponsors
Rep. Lisa Callan [D] | Rep. Skyler Rude [R] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] | Rep. Tina Orwall [D] |
Rep. Beth Doglio [D] | Rep. Mike Steele [R] | Rep. Christine Kilduff [D] | Rep. Michelle Caldier [R] |
Rep. Lauren Davis [D] | Rep. Chris Corry [R] | Rep. Tana Senn [D] | Rep. Alex Ybarra [R] |
Rep. My-Linh Thai [D] | Rep. Bill Ramos [D] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Rep. Sharon Santos [D] |
Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] | Sen. Chris Gildon [R] | Rep. Steve Bergquist [D] | Rep. Jesse Johnson [D] |
Sen. Noel Frame [D] | Rep. Nicole Macri [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | House | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-18 | House | Chapter 39, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-18 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-09 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 42; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2020-02-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2020-02-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-12 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-03 | House | ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-30 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6449 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.