WA HB2595 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning smoke detection devices.
Title
Concerning smoke detection devices.
Sponsors
Sen. Matt Boehnke [R] | Rep. Mike Chapman [D] | Rep. Tom Dent [R] | Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] |
Rep. Keith Goehner [R] | Rep. Mike Steele [R] | Rep. Carolyn Eslick [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-05 | House | CRJ - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |