WA HB2607 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-4)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Assisting homeless individuals in obtaining Washington state identicards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Assisting homeless individuals in obtaining Washington state identicards.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 87 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-25HouseEffective date 6/11/2020.
2020-03-25HouseChapter 124, 2020 Laws.
2020-03-25HouseGovernor signed.
2020-03-11HouseDelivered to Governor.
2020-03-10SenatePresident signed.
2020-03-07HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-03-05SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2020-03-05SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-04SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2020-03-02SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-03-02SenateMinority; do not pass.
2020-03-02SenateTRAN - Majority; do pass.
2020-03-02SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-25SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2020-02-20SenateFirst reading, referred to Transportation.
2020-02-18HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 87; nays, 11; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2020-02-18HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-18House1st substitute bill substituted
2020-02-17HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2020-02-11HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2020-02-11HouseMinority; do not pass.
2020-02-11HouseTR - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Human Services & Early Learning.
2020-02-11HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 12:00 PM.
2020-02-10HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-03HouseReferred to Transportation.
2020-01-29HouseMinority; do not pass.
2020-01-29HouseHSEL - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-01-29HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM.
2020-01-24HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 8:00 AM.
2020-01-16HouseFirst reading, referred to Human Services & Early Learning.

Same As/Similar To

SB6304 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-29 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2607&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2607.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2607-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/2607-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/2607-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121413&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-18-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2607&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121413&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-05-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2607&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback