WA HB2611 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-07 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Promoting the development of the Washington state bioeconomy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Promoting the development of the Washington state bioeconomy.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-07HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2020-02-04HouseITED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-02-04HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM.
2020-01-29HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM.
2020-01-16HouseFirst reading, referred to Innovation, Technology & Economic Development.

Same As/Similar To

SB6435 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-22 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback