WA HB2614 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Effective date 6/11/2020*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Effective date 6/11/2020*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning paid family and medical leave.
Title
Concerning paid family and medical leave.
Sponsors
Sen. June Robinson [D] | Rep. Beth Doglio [D] | Rep. Michael Sells [D] | Rep. Debra Lekanoff [D] |
Rep. Steve Tharinger [D] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-25 | House | Effective date 6/11/2020*. |
2020-03-25 | House | Chapter 125, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-25 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-09 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 38; nays, 10; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Committee amendment not adopted. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 12:00 PM. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:30 AM. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2020-02-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 60; nays, 37; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-13 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-12 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-08 | House | APP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Labor & Workplace Standards. |
2020-02-08 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-03 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-01-23 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-01-23 | House | LAWS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6349 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.