WA HB2619 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-03 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing early learning access through licensing, eligibility, and rate improvements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increasing early learning access through licensing, eligibility, and rate improvements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-03HouseEffective date 6/11/2020.
2020-04-03HouseChapter 343, 2020 Laws PV.
2020-04-03HouseGovernor partially vetoed.
2020-03-09HouseDelivered to Governor.
2020-03-07SenatePresident signed.
2020-03-06HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-03-04SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2020-03-04SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-04SenatePlaced on second reading consent calendar.
2020-03-02SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-03-02SenateWM - Majority; do pass.
2020-03-02SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2020-02-29SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM.
2020-02-28SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2020-02-28SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2020-02-28SenateEDU - Majority; do pass.
2020-02-28SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM.
2020-02-24SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-17SenateFirst reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.
2020-02-13HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-02-13HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-12HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2020-02-11HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2020-02-10HouseMinority; do not pass.
2020-02-10HouseAPP - Majority; do pass.
2020-02-10HousePublic hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-04HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2020-02-03HouseHSEL - Majority; do pass.
2020-01-31HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 8:00 AM.
2020-01-28HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM.
2020-01-16HouseFirst reading, referred to Human Services & Early Learning.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback