WA HB2621 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creating regulation exemptions for rural health clinics providing services in a designated home health shortage area.
Title
Creating regulation exemptions for rural health clinics providing services in a designated home health shortage area.
Sponsors
Rep. Jacquelin Maycumber [R] | Rep. Steve Tharinger [D] | Rep. Joe Schmick [R] | Rep. Mike Chapman [D] |
Sen. Drew MacEwen [R] | Rep. Carolyn Eslick [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-14 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2020-02-14 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-02-14 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-14 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-04 | House | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-04 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-31 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6359 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-31 - Effective date 6/11/2020.