WA HB2629 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Waiving utility connection charges for certain properties.
Title
Waiving utility connection charges for certain properties.
Sponsors
Rep. Amy Walen [D] | Rep. Roger Goodman [D] | Rep. Lawrence Springer [D] | Rep. Nicole Macri [D] |
Rep. Vandana Slatter [D] | Rep. Davina Duerr [D] | Rep. Shelley Kloba [D] | Rep. Jenny Graham [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-16 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | LGOV - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2020-02-16 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 70; nays, 26; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-02-16 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-16 | House | Floor amendment |
2020-02-16 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-05 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-05 | House | HOUS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-31 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-28 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Housing, Community Development & Veterans. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6414 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.