WA HB2630 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-28 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-28 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a limited property tax exemption for the construction of accessory dwelling units.
Title
Providing a limited property tax exemption for the construction of accessory dwelling units.
Sponsors
Rep. Amy Walen [D] | Rep. Roger Goodman [D] | Rep. Vandana Slatter [D] | Rep. Lawrence Springer [D] |
Rep. Davina Duerr [D] | Rep. Shelley Kloba [D] | Rep. Skyler Rude [R] | Rep. Mike Chapman [D] |
Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-27 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-20 | House | Public hearing and executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6231 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-27 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2630&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2630.pdf |