WA HB2632 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on April 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-03 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on April 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-03 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning false reporting of a crime or emergency.
Title
Concerning false reporting of a crime or emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 90 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-03 | House | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-04-03 | House | Chapter 344, 2020 Laws. |
2020-04-03 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-12 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-11 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 90; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-11 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate receded from amendments. |
2020-03-07 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments. Asks Senate to recede from amendments. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2020-02-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-12 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-06 | House | PS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-06 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-28 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6295 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.