WA HB2637 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-4)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding school library information and technology programs.
Title
Expanding school library information and technology programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-02-06 | House | ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-06 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-28 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6371 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-07 - Referred to Ways & Means.