WA HB2654 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring uniform reporting of certain fiscal details by community and technical colleges.
Title
Requiring uniform reporting of certain fiscal details by community and technical colleges.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-01-29 | House | CWD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-29 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to College & Workforce Development. |