WA HB2660 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-5)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing the availability of school meals provided to public school students at no student cost.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increasing the availability of school meals provided to public school students at no student cost.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-02HouseEffective date 6/11/2020.
2020-04-02HouseChapter 288, 2020 Laws.
2020-04-02HouseGovernor signed.
2020-03-12HouseDelivered to Governor.
2020-03-12SenatePresident signed.
2020-03-11HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-03-10HousePassed final passage; yeas, 95; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-03-10HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments.
2020-03-05SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2020-03-05SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-05SenateCommittee amendment
2020-03-04SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2020-03-02SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-03-02SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2020-03-02SenateMinority; do not pass.
2020-03-02SenateWM - Majority; do pass with amendment
2020-03-02SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2020-02-29SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM.
2020-02-28SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2020-02-28SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2020-02-28SenateEDU - Majority; do pass with amendment
2020-02-28SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM.
2020-02-26SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-20SenateFirst reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.
2020-02-17HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2020-02-17HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-17HouseFloor amendment
2020-02-17House1st substitute bill substituted
2020-02-14HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2020-02-11HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2020-02-10HouseMinority; do not pass.
2020-02-10HouseAPP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Education.
2020-02-10HousePublic hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-07HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2020-02-06HouseED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-02-06HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM.
2020-01-28HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Education at 3:30 PM.
2020-01-16HouseFirst reading, referred to Education.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2660&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2660.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2660-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2660-S.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/2660-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/2660-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121570&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-17-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2660&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121570&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-05-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2660&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121570&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-10-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2660&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback