WA HB2662 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-10)
Status: Passed on April 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-03 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Reducing the total cost of insulin.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reducing the total cost of insulin.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-09 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-03HouseEffective date 6/11/2020.
2020-04-03HouseChapter 346, 2020 Laws.
2020-04-03HouseGovernor signed.
2020-03-12HouseDelivered to Governor.
2020-03-12SenatePresident signed.
2020-03-11HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-03-09HousePassed final passage; yeas, 95; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2020-03-09HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments.
2020-03-06SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-03-06SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-06SenateCommittee amendment
2020-03-04SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2020-03-02SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-03-02SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2020-03-02SenateWM - Majority; do pass with amendment
2020-03-02SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2020-02-29SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM.
2020-02-28SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2020-02-28SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2020-02-28SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2020-02-28SenateHLTC - Majority; do pass with amendment
2020-02-28SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM.
2020-02-26SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-24SenateFirst reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.
2020-02-19HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2020-02-19HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-19HouseFloor amendment
2020-02-19House2nd substitute bill substituted
2020-02-14HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2020-02-11HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2020-02-11HouseMinority; do not pass.
2020-02-11HouseAPP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-02-11HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2020-02-10HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-07HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2020-02-05HouseHCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-02-05HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-04HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2020-01-31HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM.
2020-01-28HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2020-01-16HouseFirst reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2662&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2662.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2662-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2662-S2.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2662-S2.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/2662-S2.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/2662-S2.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121572&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-19-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2662&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121572&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-06-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2662&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121572&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-09-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2662&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback