WA HB2677 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Sharing health insurance information to improve the coordination of benefits between health insurers and the health care authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sharing health insurance information to improve the coordination of benefits between health insurers and the health care authority.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-16 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-27HouseEffective date 6/11/2020.
2020-03-27HouseChapter 183, 2020 Laws.
2020-03-27HouseGovernor signed.
2020-03-09HouseDelivered to Governor.
2020-03-06SenatePresident signed.
2020-03-05HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-03-03SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2020-03-03SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-02SenatePlaced on second reading consent calendar.
2020-02-27SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-02-26SenateHLTC - Majority; do pass.
2020-02-26SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-24SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-18SenateFirst reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.
2020-02-16HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2020-02-16HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-12HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2020-02-06HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2020-02-05HouseHCW - Majority; do pass.
2020-02-04HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2020-01-31HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM.
2020-01-17HouseFirst reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.

Same As/Similar To

SB6395 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-16 - First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback