WA HB2679 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning funding for individuals who are not eligible for federal insurance subsidies and for foundational public health services.
Title
Concerning funding for individuals who are not eligible for federal insurance subsidies and for foundational public health services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-08 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-08 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-08 | House | APP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-08 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-06 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-17 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6451 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-30 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.