WA HB2681 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Preventing harassment, abuse, and discrimination experienced by long-term care workers.
Title
Preventing harassment, abuse, and discrimination experienced by long-term care workers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-18 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-11 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-11 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-11 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-11 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-10 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-02-06 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-06 | House | LAWS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-06 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-04 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-28 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-17 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6205 (Crossfiled) 2020-04-02 - Effective date 6/11/2020.