WA HB2686 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Excluding the common carrier licensees from the definition of retailer for the purposes of the three-tier system.
Title
Excluding the common carrier licensees from the definition of retailer for the purposes of the three-tier system.
Sponsors
Rep. Tina Orwall [D] | Sen. Drew MacEwen [R] | Rep. Richard DeBolt [R] | Rep. Brian Blake [D] |
Rep. Jake Fey [D] | Rep. Brandon Vick [R] | Rep. Lawrence Springer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-03 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-03 | House | COG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-17 | House | First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6095 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-27 - Effective date 6/11/2020.