WA HB2687 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Planning for affordable housing under the growth management act.
Title
Planning for affordable housing under the growth management act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-17 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2020-02-17 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-02-17 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-17 | House | Floor amendment |
2020-02-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-04 | House | ENVI - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-04 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-30 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-17 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |