WA HB2701 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Effective date 7/1/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Effective date 7/1/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning inspection and testing of fire and smoke control systems and dampers.
Title
Concerning inspection and testing of fire and smoke control systems and dampers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-07 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | House | Effective date 7/1/2021. |
2020-03-19 | House | Chapter 88, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-19 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-11 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-07 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 3. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | LGOV - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2020-02-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-07 | House | LG - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-07 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-31 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-20 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |