WA HB2711 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing equitable educational outcomes for foster care and homeless children and youth from prekindergarten to postsecondary education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increasing equitable educational outcomes for foster care and homeless children and youth from prekindergarten to postsecondary education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-31HouseEffective date 6/11/2020.
2020-03-31HouseChapter 233, 2020 Laws.
2020-03-31HouseGovernor signed.
2020-03-12HouseDelivered to Governor.
2020-03-12SenatePresident signed.
2020-03-12HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-03-11HousePassed final passage; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-03-11HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments.
2020-03-10SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3.
2020-03-10SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-10SenateFloor amendment
2020-03-10SenateReturned to second reading for amendment.
2020-03-10SenateRules suspended.
2020-03-10SenateSenate receded from amendments.
2020-03-10HouseHouse refuses to concur in Senate amendments. Asks Senate to recede from amendments.
2020-03-05SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2020-03-05SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-05SenateCommittee amendment
2020-03-04SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2020-03-02SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-02-29SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2020-02-29SenateWM - Majority; do pass with amendment
2020-02-29SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM.
2020-02-28SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2020-02-25SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2020-02-24SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2020-02-24SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2020-02-24SenateEDU - Majority; do pass with amendment
2020-02-24SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-21SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM.
2020-02-17SenateFirst reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.
2020-02-13HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-02-13HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-13House1st substitute bill substituted
2020-02-12HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2020-02-11HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2020-02-11HouseMinority; do not pass.
2020-02-11HouseAPP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Education.
2020-02-11HousePublic hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2020-02-07HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2020-02-06HouseED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-02-06HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM.
2020-01-28HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Education at 3:30 PM.
2020-01-20HouseFirst reading, referred to Education.

Same As/Similar To

SB6511 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2711&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2711.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2711-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/2711-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/2711-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121715&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-13-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2711&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121715&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-05-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2711&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121715&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-10-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2711&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121715&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-11-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2711&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback