WA HB2713 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Encouraging compost procurement and use.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Encouraging compost procurement and use.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-09 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-16 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-02HouseEffective date 6/11/2020.
2020-04-02HouseChapter 290, 2020 Laws PV.
2020-04-02HouseGovernor partially vetoed.
2020-03-12HouseDelivered to Governor.
2020-03-12SenatePresident signed.
2020-03-11HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-03-09HousePassed final passage; yeas, 95; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2020-03-09HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments.
2020-03-05SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 0.
2020-03-05SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-05SenateCommittee amendment
2020-03-04SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2020-03-02SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-03-02SenateWM - Majority; do pass with amendment
2020-03-02SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2020-02-28SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2020-02-27SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2020-02-26SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2020-02-26SenateMinority; do not pass.
2020-02-26SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2020-02-26SenateENET - Majority; do pass with amendment
2020-02-26SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM.
2020-02-25SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM.
2020-02-18SenateFirst reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology.
2020-02-16HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2020-02-16HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-16HouseFloor amendment
2020-02-16House1st substitute bill substituted
2020-02-14HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2020-02-11HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2020-02-10HouseAPP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by State Government & Tribal Relations.
2020-02-10HousePublic hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-07HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2020-02-07HouseSGOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-02-07HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM.
2020-02-05HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM.
2020-01-20HouseFirst reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2713&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2713.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2713-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2713-S.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/2713-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/2713-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121717&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-16-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2713&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121717&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-05-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2713&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121717&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-09-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2713&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback