WA HB2714 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Valuing the carbon in forest riparian easements.
Title
Valuing the carbon in forest riparian easements.
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Hoff [R] | Rep. Joe Fitzgibbon [D] | Rep. Ed Orcutt [R] | Rep. Brian Blake [D] |
Rep. Mike Chapman [D] | Rep. Debra Lekanoff [D] | Rep. Luanne Van Werven [R] | Rep. Steve Tharinger [D] |
Rep. Joel Kretz [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-16 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | AWNP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |
2020-02-16 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-02-16 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-16 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-10 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-10 | House | APP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources. |
2020-02-10 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-08 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-06 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-02-04 | House | RDAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-04 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-28 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-20 | House | First reading, referred to Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6498 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-30 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM.