WA HB2721 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Extending the joint center for aerospace technology innovation program.
Title
Extending the joint center for aerospace technology innovation program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-02-04 | House | ITED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-04 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-20 | House | First reading, referred to Innovation, Technology & Economic Development. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6139 (Crossfiled) 2020-04-02 - Effective date 6/11/2020.