WA HB2722 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning placement of sixteen and seventeen year olds arrested for domestic violence assault.
Title
Concerning placement of sixteen and seventeen year olds arrested for domestic violence assault.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Roberts [D] | Rep. Ruth Kagi [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-11 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | HSC - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |
2014-02-11 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 53; nays, 45; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-02-11 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-11 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-07 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-04 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-01-30 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-01-30 | House | ELHS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-01-30 | House | ELHS - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-01-30 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 10:00 AM. |
2014-01-28 | House | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services |