WA HB2722 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-03 - Governor vetoed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning minimum recycled content requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning minimum recycled content requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-03HouseGovernor vetoed.
2020-03-12HouseDelivered to Governor.
2020-03-12SenatePresident signed.
2020-03-12HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-03-11HousePassed final passage; yeas, 57; nays, 40; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-03-11HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments.
2020-03-10SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 28; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2020-03-10SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-10SenateFloor amendment
2020-03-10SenateReturned to second reading for amendment.
2020-03-10SenateSenate receded from amendments.
2020-03-07HouseHouse refuses to concur in Senate amendments. Asks Senate to recede from amendments.
2020-03-05SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 30; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2020-03-05SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-05SenateCommittee amendment
2020-03-04SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2020-03-02SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-03-02SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2020-03-02SenateMinority; do not pass.
2020-03-02SenateWM - Majority; do pass with amendment
2020-03-02SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2020-02-29SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM.
2020-02-28SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2020-02-27SenateMinority; do not pass.
2020-02-27SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2020-02-27SenateENET - Majority; do pass with amendment
2020-02-27SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM.
2020-02-25SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM.
2020-02-20SenatePublic hearing scheduled, but not heard in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM.
2020-02-17SenateFirst reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology.
2020-02-13HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 64; nays, 32; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2020-02-13HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-13HouseFloor amendment
2020-02-13House1st substitute bill substituted
2020-02-10HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2020-02-07HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2020-02-06HouseMinority; do not pass.
2020-02-06HouseENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-02-06HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM.
2020-02-03HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 1:30 PM.
2020-01-30HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM.
2020-01-20HouseFirst reading, referred to Environment & Energy.

Same As/Similar To

SB6645 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-04 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2722&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2722.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2722-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2722-S.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/2722-S.PL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121725&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-13-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2722&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121725&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-05-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2722&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121725&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-10-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2722&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121725&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-11-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2722&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback