WA HB2730 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing military spouse employment.
Title
Addressing military spouse employment.
Sponsors
Rep. Christine Kilduff [D] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Rep. Bradley Klippert [R] | Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] |
Rep. Michelle Caldier [R] | Rep. Lauren Davis [D] | Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | SGTE - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
2020-02-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-13 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-12 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-01-31 | House | CRJ - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-28 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-20 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |