WA HB2757 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning official state designations.
Title
Concerning official state designations.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Corry [R] | Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] | Rep. Skyler Rude [R] | Sen. Noel Frame [D] |
Rep. Tom Dent [R] | Rep. Marcus Riccelli [D] | Rep. Lauren Davis [D] | Rep. Debra Lekanoff [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
2020-02-19 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 91; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-02-19 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-07 | House | SGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-07 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-21 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |