WA HB2762 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Extending the peer support group testimonial privilege to include staff persons of the department of corrections.
Title
Extending the peer support group testimonial privilege to include staff persons of the department of corrections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | House | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-18 | House | Chapter 42, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-18 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-09 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2020-02-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-12 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-05 | House | CRJ - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-21 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |