WA HB2763 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning interest arbitration for department of corrections employees.
Title
Concerning interest arbitration for department of corrections employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-16 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-16 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | House | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-19 | House | Chapter 89, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-19 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-11 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-29 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2020-02-16 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 79; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-02-16 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-10 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-10 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-10 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-01-30 | House | LAWS - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-30 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-21 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6456 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-17 - First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce.