WA HB2769 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the prevention of derelict vessels.
Title
Concerning the prevention of derelict vessels.
Sponsors
Rep. Debra Lekanoff [D] | Rep. Brian Blake [D] | Sen. John Lovick [D] | Sen. Sharon Shewmake [D] |
Rep. Alex Ramel [D] | Rep. Joe Fitzgibbon [D] | Rep. Eileen Cody [D] | Rep. Steve Tharinger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-02-05 | House | RDAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-21 | House | First reading, referred to Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6528 (Crossfiled) 2020-04-01 - Effective date 6/11/2020.