WA HB2775 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Practicing colon hydrotherapy.
Title
Practicing colon hydrotherapy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Public hearing and executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-19 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-02-19 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-19 | House | Floor amendment |
2020-02-19 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-19 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-07 | House | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-07 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-05 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-04 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-21 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |