WA HB2786 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the opioid epidemic response advisory council.
Title
Establishing the opioid epidemic response advisory council.
Sponsors
Sen. June Robinson [D] | Rep. Lauren Davis [D] | Rep. Mike Chapman [D] | Rep. Strom Peterson [D] |
Rep. Lisa Callan [D] | Rep. Debra Lekanoff [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] | Rep. Steve Bergquist [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-16 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-16 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 68; nays, 28; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-02-16 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-16 | House | Floor amendment |
2020-02-16 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-03 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-03 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-03 | House | APP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-22 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |