WA HB2787 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Effective date 9/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Effective date 9/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Completing the transfer of the early support for infants and toddlers program from the office of the superintendent of public instruction to the department of children, youth, and families.
Title
Completing the transfer of the early support for infants and toddlers program from the office of the superintendent of public instruction to the department of children, youth, and families.
Sponsors
Rep. Lisa Callan [D] | Rep. Paul Harris [R] | Rep. Carolyn Eslick [R] | Rep. Tana Senn [D] |
Rep. Monica Stonier [D] | Rep. Sharon Santos [D] | Rep. Steve Tharinger [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | House | Effective date 9/1/2020. |
2020-03-19 | House | Chapter 90, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-19 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-11 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2020-02-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-13 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-12 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-10 | House | APP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Human Services & Early Learning. |
2020-02-10 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-02-07 | House | HSEL - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-07 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-22 | House | First reading, referred to Human Services & Early Learning. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6547 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-07 - Referred to Ways & Means.