WA HB2794 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Effective date 6/11/2020*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Effective date 6/11/2020*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning juvenile record sealing.
Title
Concerning juvenile record sealing.
Sponsors
Sen. Noel Frame [D] | Rep. Lauren Davis [D] | Rep. Strom Peterson [D] | Rep. Debra Lekanoff [D] |
Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] | Rep. Sharon Santos [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 62 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 36 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 36 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-27 | House | Effective date 6/11/2020*. |
2020-03-27 | House | Chapter 184, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-27 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-12 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-09 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 62; nays, 34; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-03-09 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 36; nays, 11; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | HSRR - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |
2020-02-19 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 64; nays, 34; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-02-19 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-19 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-18 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-07 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-07 | House | HSEL - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-07 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-05 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-04 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-22 | House | First reading, referred to Human Services & Early Learning. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5182 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.