WA HB2803 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the governor to enter into compacts with Indian tribes addressing certain state retail sales tax, certain state use tax, and certain state business and occupation tax revenues, as specified in a memorandum of understanding entered into by the state, Tulalip tribes, and Snohomish county, in January 2020, and including other terms necessary for the department of revenue to administer any such compact.
Title
Authorizing the governor to enter into compacts with Indian tribes addressing certain state retail sales tax, certain state use tax, and certain state business and occupation tax revenues, as specified in a memorandum of understanding entered into by the state, Tulalip tribes, and Snohomish county, in January 2020, and including other terms necessary for the department of revenue to administer any such compact.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-25 | House | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-25 | House | Chapter 132, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-25 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-11 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 32; nays, 16; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Held on third reading. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-18 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-02-18 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-18 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-16 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-07 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-07 | House | FIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-07 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-30 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-22 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6601 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-09 - Senate Rules "X" file.