WA HB2804 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing local government infrastructure.
Title
Addressing local government infrastructure.
Sponsors
Rep. Davina Duerr [D] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] | Rep. Vandana Slatter [D] |
Sen. Matt Boehnke [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Public hearing and executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-03-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-04 | House | Floor amendment |
2020-03-04 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-26 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2020-02-21 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-16 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-10 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Local Government. |
2020-02-10 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2020-02-07 | House | LG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-07 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-22 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |