WA HB2811 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing a statewide environmental sustainability education program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a statewide environmental sustainability education program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 91 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-02HouseEffective date 6/11/2020.
2020-04-02HouseChapter 292, 2020 Laws.
2020-04-02HouseGovernor signed.
2020-03-12HouseDelivered to Governor.
2020-03-12SenatePresident signed.
2020-03-11HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-03-10HousePassed final passage; yeas, 57; nays, 40; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-03-10HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments.
2020-03-06SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-03-06SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-06SenateCommittee amendment
2020-03-05SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2020-02-25SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-02-24SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2020-02-24SenateEDU - Majority; do pass with amendment
2020-02-24SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-21SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM.
2020-02-14SenateFirst reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.
2020-02-12HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 91; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-02-12HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-12HouseFloor amendment
2020-02-10HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2020-02-05HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2020-02-03HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2020-02-03HouseMinority; do not pass.
2020-02-03HouseAPP - Majority; do pass.
2020-02-03HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2020-01-30HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2020-01-23HouseFirst reading, referred to Appropriations.

Same As/Similar To

SB6124 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-15 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2811&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2811.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2811.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/2811.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/2811.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121930&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-12-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2811&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121930&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-06-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2811&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121930&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-10-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2811&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback