WA HB2815 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning library districts.
Title
Concerning library districts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-07 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-07 | House | LG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-07 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-23 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6305 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-27 - Effective date 6/11/2020.